IA HF644 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying provisions applicable to the renewable energy tax credit, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 235)
Title
A bill for an act modifying provisions applicable to the renewable energy tax credit, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 235)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Bolkcom, and Schultz. S.J. 923. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 911. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 911. |
2015-04-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 911. |
2015-04-30 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 969. |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 3. H.J. 903. |
2015-04-15 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 863. |