IA HF642 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the release of certain confidential information by the department of human services to multidisciplinary teams and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HF 435.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the release of certain confidential information by the department of human services to multidisciplinary teams and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HF 435.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1016. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1124. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1123. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 753. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Jochum, and Segebart. S.J. 675. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 598. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 598. |
2019-03-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 523. |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 522. |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 414. |
Same As/Similar To
HF435 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 524.