IA HF641 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to alcoholic beverage control and matters under the purview of the alcoholic beverages division of the department of commerce and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 95; See HF 745.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to alcoholic beverage control and matters under the purview of the alcoholic beverages division of the department of commerce and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 95; See HF 745.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 980. |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 586. |
2019-03-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/13/2019 1:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-11 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bossman and Nielsen. H.J. 497. |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 414. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1076 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB95 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 366.
SF413 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 618. S.J. 947.
HF745 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SF618 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
HSB95 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 366.
SF413 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 618. S.J. 947.
HF745 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SF618 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF641 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF641.html |