IA HF641 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and providing for the coordination and facilitation of broadband access in targeted areas of the state, including property tax incentives for broadband infrastructure installation, a broadband grant program and fund, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 576) (Formerly HSB 104)
Title
A bill for an act relating to and providing for the coordination and facilitation of broadband access in targeted areas of the state, including property tax incentives for broadband infrastructure installation, a broadband grant program and fund, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 576) (Formerly HSB 104)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Subcommittee, Petersen, Feenstra, and McCoy. S.J. 923. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 910. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 910. |
2015-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 894. |
2015-04-30 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 969. |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 90, nays 5. H.J. 891. |
2015-04-21 | House | Amendment H-1242 filed, adopted. H.J. 891. |
2015-04-21 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-04-14 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 827. |