IA HF640 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and other properly related matters and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 199.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 57, 58 and 59 effective 5-12-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and other properly related matters and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 199.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 57, 58 and 59 effective 5-12-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | NOBA: Graybook |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1149. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 58, nays 40. H.J. 1109. |
2017-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1397. H.J. 1108. |
2017-04-18 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate amendment H-1397 filed. H.J. 1077. |
2017-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1055. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1057. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 29, nays 21. S.J. 1054. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3337 filed, adopted. S.J. 1054. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Substituted for SF 507. S.J. 1054. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 507. S.J. 1045. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1045. |
2017-04-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1029. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed House, ayes 58, nays 41. H.J. 1022. |
2017-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1358 lost. H.J. 1021. |
2017-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1358 filed. H.J. 1020. |
2017-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1352 lost. H.J. 1020. |
2017-04-17 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 1019. |
2017-04-17 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 1019. |
2017-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1353 lost. H.J. 1019. |
2017-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1353 filed. H.J. 1018. |
2017-04-14 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 1013. |
2017-04-12 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1192 (Related) 2017-04-12 - Subcommittee: Subcommittee of the Whole.
HSB199 (Related) 2017-04-12 - Committee report, recommending passage.
SF507 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1057.
HSB199 (Related) 2017-04-12 - Committee report, recommending passage.
SF507 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1057.