IA HF640 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 113.
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 113.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to indecent exposure and providing penalties. (See Cmte. Bill HF 772)
Title
A bill for an act relating to indecent exposure and providing penalties. (See Cmte. Bill HF 772)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Withdrawn. H.J. 113. | |
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-03-11 | Subcommittee, Anderson, Palmer, and Swaim. H.J. 767. | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 746. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0685C&ga=83 |