IA HF639 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the direct shipment and delivery of native distilled spirits, providing for fees, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the direct shipment and delivery of native distilled spirits, providing for fees, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | House | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2021-02-25 | House | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. |
2021-02-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 8:00AM Law Library. |
2021-02-23 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Konfrst and Sexton. H.J. 549. |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 501. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF639 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF639.html |