IA HF627 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Quirmbach, and Smith. S.J. 1017.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Quirmbach, and Smith. S.J. 1017.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting co-owners of motor vehicles of deceased persons from fees related to the issuance of certificates of title. (Formerly HF 326 & HSB 57.)
Title
A bill for an act exempting co-owners of motor vehicles of deceased persons from fees related to the issuance of certificates of title. (Formerly HF 326 & HSB 57.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Quirmbach, and Smith. S.J. 1017. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 996. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 996. |
2017-04-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 996. |
2017-04-12 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays 0. H.J. 988. |
2017-04-05 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 878. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB57 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 267.
SSB1063 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 11:00AM Room 206 (Cancelled)
HF326 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
SF476 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - Subcommittee: Edler, Dawson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 537.
SSB1063 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 11:00AM Room 206 (Cancelled)
HF326 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
SF476 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - Subcommittee: Edler, Dawson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 537.