IA HF621 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 976.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 976.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the streamlined sales and use tax agreement by the department of revenue. Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the streamlined sales and use tax agreement by the department of revenue. Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 976. |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 927. |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 927. |
2015-04-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 874. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 894. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 891. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 864. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dotzler, Breitbach, and Seng. S.J. 830. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 792. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 792. |
2015-04-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 786. |
2015-04-14 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 841. |
2015-04-07 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 766. |
2015-04-03 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 752. |
2015-04-01 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 738. |