IA HF614 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the property tax exemption for the value added by certain geothermal heating or cooling systems and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 42.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the property tax exemption for the value added by certain geothermal heating or cooling systems and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 42.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20. |
2017-04-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 818. |
2017-03-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 772. |
Same As/Similar To
HF42 (Similar To) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 710.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF614 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF614.html |