IA HF612 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1113.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1113.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to water quality by providing for appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund, creating a water quality infrastructure fund, establishing new water quality programs, providing for cost-share programs for infrastructure on agricultural land under the water quality initiative, creating a state water service excise tax and a related sales tax exemption, making appropriations and other changes properly related to water quality, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 135 & HF 538.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to water quality by providing for appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund, creating a water quality infrastructure fund, establishing new water quality programs, providing for cost-share programs for infrastructure on agricultural land under the water quality initiative, creating a state water service excise tax and a related sales tax exemption, making appropriations and other changes properly related to water quality, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 135 & HF 538.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1113. |
2017-04-20 | House | SF 512 substituted. H.J. 1112. |
2017-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1418 out of order. H.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1439 filed, adopted. H.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee amendment H-1404 adopted. H.J. 1111. |
2017-04-19 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-04-19 | House | Amendment H-1418 filed. H.J. 1099. |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee amendment H-1404 filed. H.J. 1098. |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1098. |
2017-04-06 | House | Subcommittee: Deyoe, Bearinger and Rogers. H.J. 919. |
2017-03-29 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-27 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 772. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB135 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 491.
HF538 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1113.
HF538 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1113.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF612 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF612.html |