IA HF608 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the tracking and counting of mailed absentee ballots. (See HF 692.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the tracking and counting of mailed absentee ballots. (See HF 692.)
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 562. |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422. |
2019-03-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 4:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-04 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Hunter and Sexton. H.J. 393. |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 390. |
Same As/Similar To
HF692 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF608 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF608.html |