IA HF608 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the technical administration of the tax laws by the department of revenue, including administration of the research activities credit, income taxes, and the flood mitigation program, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 121.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 1, 10 and 11 effective 5-11-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the technical administration of the tax laws by the department of revenue, including administration of the research activities credit, income taxes, and the flood mitigation program, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 121.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 1, 10 and 11 effective 5-11-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1149. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays 0. H.J. 1107. |
2017-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1398. H.J. 1106. |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate amendment H-1398 filed. H.J. 1077. |
2017-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1055. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1057. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 1051. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3313 adopted. S.J. 1050. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Amendment S-3313 filed. S.J. 1001. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 1001. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Jochum, and Smith. S.J. 902. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 860. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 860. |
2017-04-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 863. |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays 0. H.J. 857. |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 818. |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 706. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB121 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 710.