IA HF60 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 806.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 806.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the allocation of nonresident deer hunting licenses, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 806.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the allocation of nonresident deer hunting licenses, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 806.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 806. |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 601. |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 12:15PM House Lounge. |
2021-02-03 | House | Subcommittee: McClintock, Baxter and Breckenridge. H.J. 289. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 92. |
Same As/Similar To
HF806 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 965.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF60 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF60.html |