IA HF60 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to health care administrative simplification.
Title
A bill for an act relating to health care administrative simplification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2019 10:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Best and Forbes. H.J. 136. |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 132. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF60 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF60.html |