IA HF6 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to voluntary diversity plans under the state's open enrollment law.
Title
A bill for an act relating to voluntary diversity plans under the state's open enrollment law.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Fisher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2019 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Shipley, Kerr and Matson. H.J. 150. |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 87. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1034 (Related) 2019-02-04 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF199 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 324.
SF199 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 324.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF6 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF6.html |