IA HF563 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Amendment S-3311 filed. S.J. 1002.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Amendment S-3311 filed. S.J. 1002.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for certain emergency medical procedures training requirements for school coaches and concussion and brain injury policies for certain extracurricular interscholastic activities, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 17.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for certain emergency medical procedures training requirements for school coaches and concussion and brain injury policies for certain extracurricular interscholastic activities, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 17.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Amendment S-3311 filed. S.J. 1002. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 815. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bowman, and Chelgren. S.J. 720. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 648. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 648. |
2017-03-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 666. |
2017-03-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 659. |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment H-1185 adopted. H.J. 658. |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment H-1185 filed. H.J. 645. |
2017-03-13 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 555. |
Same As/Similar To
HF17 (Similar To) 2017-03-15 - NOBA: House Full Approps