IA HF562 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Boulton, and Goodwin. S.J. 509.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Boulton, and Goodwin. S.J. 509.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to funding emergency medical services by modifying provisions relating to city emergency medical services districts, benefited emergency medical services districts, and optional taxes for emergency medical services.(Formerly HSB 186.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to funding emergency medical services by modifying provisions relating to city emergency medical services districts, benefited emergency medical services districts, and optional taxes for emergency medical services.(Formerly HSB 186.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Boulton, and Goodwin. S.J. 509. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Rereferred to State Government. S.J. 462. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 451. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 451. |
2021-02-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 529. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1204. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 546. |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays none. H.J. 527. |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 404. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB186 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 562.