IA HF548 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 825.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 825.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to continuous quality improvement for the care of individuals with stroke. (Formerly HF 274.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to continuous quality improvement for the care of individuals with stroke. (Formerly HF 274.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 825. |
2017-03-28 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 804. |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 804. |
2017-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 761. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 746. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 788. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 746. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Substituted for SF 457. S.J. 746. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Attached to similar SF 457. S.J. 736. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 686. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 686. |
2017-03-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 695. |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays 0. H.J. 692. |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment H-1195 adopted. H.J. 691. |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment H-1195 filed. H.J. 645. |
2017-03-13 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 534. |
Same As/Similar To
HF274 (Similar To) 2017-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 695.