IA HF548 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county support of county civil service commissions. (Formerly HSB 178)
Title
A bill for an act relating to county support of county civil service commissions. (Formerly HSB 178)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 751. | |
2011-03-22 | Message from House. S.J. 751. | |
2011-03-21 | Immediate message. H.J. 739. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed House, ayes 66, nays 33. H.J. 737. | |
2011-03-04 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 532. |