IA HF545 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the public disclosure of information regarding founded child abuse involving a child fatality or near fatality. (Formerly HSB 80.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the public disclosure of information regarding founded child abuse involving a child fatality or near fatality. (Formerly HSB 80.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142. |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1075. |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1075. |
2017-04-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 922. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 945. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 944. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 817. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Garrett, and Ragan. S.J. 687. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 648. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 648. |
2017-03-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 666. |
2017-03-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 658. |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 533. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB80 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 484.
SSB1070 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee: Costello, C. Johnson, and Ragan.
SSB1070 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee: Costello, C. Johnson, and Ragan.