IA HF540 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 746.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 746.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to considerations required before a county board of supervisors leases, purchases, or constructs a facility or building.(Formerly HF 295.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to considerations required before a county board of supervisors leases, purchases, or constructs a facility or building.(Formerly HF 295.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 746. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 708. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/23/2023 12:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Guth, and Quirmbach. S.J. 645. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 573. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 573. |
2023-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 620. |
2023-03-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 653. |
2023-03-14 | House | Passed House, yeas 86, nays 11. H.J. 610. |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 454. |
Same As/Similar To
HF295 (Similar To) 2023-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 620.