IA HF529 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 875.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 875.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to drainage and levee districts, by providing for mergers, repairs and improvements, and elections. Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to drainage and levee districts, by providing for mergers, repairs and improvements, and elections. Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 875. |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 842. |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 842. |
2015-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 811. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 829. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 828. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 775. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hart, Sinclair, and Taylor. S.J. 681. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 663. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 663. |
2015-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 659. |
2015-03-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 690. |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 652. |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 477. |