IA HF495 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 782.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 782.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act extending the beginning farmer tax credit program and appropriations used to support the program, including the agricultural assets transfer tax credit and the custom farming contract tax credit. (Formerly HSB 140; See HF 2490.)
Title
A bill for an act extending the beginning farmer tax credit program and appropriations used to support the program, including the agricultural assets transfer tax credit and the custom farming contract tax credit. (Formerly HSB 140; See HF 2490.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 782. |
2018-03-15 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-03-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Hein, Kaufmann and Kearns. H.J. 149. |
2017-03-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-03-07 | House | Subcommittee: Sieck, Kearns and Mohr. H.J. 543. |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 498. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB140 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 483.
HF2490 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Amendment H-8482 filed. H.J. 951.
HF2490 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Amendment H-8482 filed. H.J. 951.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF495 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF495.html |