IA HF486 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 856.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 856.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the payment of writing fees when purchasing a combination package of hunting or fishing licenses. (Formerly HSB 194) (See Cmte. Bill HF 625)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the payment of writing fees when purchasing a combination package of hunting or fishing licenses. (Formerly HSB 194) (See Cmte. Bill HF 625)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 856. |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-24 | House | Subcommittee, Maxwell, Moore, and Ruff. H.J. 691. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 462. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HF486 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF486.html |