IA HF481 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act providing an excess weight allowance for special trucks hauling distillers grains. Effective 7-01-09.
Title
A bill for an act providing an excess weight allowance for special trucks hauling distillers grains. Effective 7-01-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-05-18 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 2129. | |
2009-04-26 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 2128. | |
2009-04-26 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 2128. | |
2009-04-07 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1188. | |
2009-04-06 | Immediate message. S.J. 974. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 1. S.J. 974. | |
2009-04-01 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 927. | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 869. | |
2009-03-26 | Message from House. S.J. 869. | |
2009-03-26 | Immediate message. H.J. 1042. | |
2009-03-26 | Passed House, ayes 92, nays 2. H.J. 1041. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 629. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0518C&ga=83 |