IA HF478 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to revenue and taxation by modifying the transfer of moneys from the Iowa economic emergency fund to the taxpayers trust fund, creating an Iowa taxpayers trust fund tax credit and fund and providing for the transfer of moneys for purposes of the credit, creating an alternative base income tax and an alternative cumulative income surtax imposed at the election of the taxpayer and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 3)
Title
A bill for an act relating to revenue and taxation by modifying the transfer of moneys from the Iowa economic emergency fund to the taxpayers trust fund, creating an Iowa taxpayers trust fund tax credit and fund and providing for the transfer of moneys for purposes of the credit, creating an alternative base income tax and an alternative cumulative income surtax imposed at the election of the taxpayer and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 3)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Bolkcom, and Feenstra. S.J. 580. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 550. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 550. |
2013-03-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 543. |
2013-03-13 | House | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 47. H.J. 541. |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment H-1078 adopted. H.J. 541. |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment H-1067 withdrawn. H.J. 540. |
2013-03-12 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2013-03-12 | House | Amendment H-1078 filed. H.J. 526. |
2013-03-11 | House | Amendment H-1067 filed. H.J. 488. |
2013-03-07 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 444. |