IA HF472 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the conduct of licensed veterinarians when involved in certain legal matters involving the alleged mistreatment of animals, including by providing for immunity from administrative, civil, or criminal liability when acting in good faith; providing for administrative, civil, or criminal liability when not acting in good faith; and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HSB 181.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the conduct of licensed veterinarians when involved in certain legal matters involving the alleged mistreatment of animals, including by providing for immunity from administrative, civil, or criminal liability when acting in good faith; providing for administrative, civil, or criminal liability when not acting in good faith; and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HSB 181.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 207. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 10:30AM Room G15. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Driscoll. S.J. 99. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 721. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 316. S.J. 539. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 539. |
2023-03-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 539. |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 1. H.J. 536. |
2023-02-28 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 432. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1038 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 316.
SF316 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091.
HSB181 (Related) 2023-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 472.
SF316 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091.
HSB181 (Related) 2023-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 472.