IA HF469 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the election of commissioners of soil and water conservation districts. (Formerly HF 244.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the election of commissioners of soil and water conservation districts. (Formerly HF 244.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008. |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 904. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 911. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 911. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 662. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Bowman, and Brown. S.J. 605. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 541. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 541. |
2017-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 563. |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays 0. H.J. 550. |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 478. |
Same As/Similar To
HF244 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 562.