IA HF468 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 924.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 924.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of mental health advocates. Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the appointment of mental health advocates. Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 924. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 895. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 884. |
2015-04-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 862. |
2015-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 895. |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed House, ayes 91, nays 1. H.J. 860. |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1209. H.J. 860. |
2015-04-08 | House | Senate amendment H-1209 filed. H.J. 809. |
2015-04-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 807. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 809. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 809. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3072 adopted. S.J. 809. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3072 filed. S.J. 725. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 725. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee, Jochum, Dotzler, and Segebart. S.J. 592. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 560. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 560. |
2015-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 548. |
2015-03-12 | House | Expanation of vote. H.J. 577. |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 2. H.J. 540. |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 451. |