IA HF454 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 886.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 886.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to various matters involving insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 139) (See Cmte. Bill HF 632)
Title
A bill for an act relating to various matters involving insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 139) (See Cmte. Bill HF 632)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 886. |
2015-04-01 | House | Amendment H-1171 filed. H.J. 746. |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-16 | House | Subcommittee, Grassley, McConkey, and L. Miller. H.J. 583. |
2015-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 441. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HF454 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF454.html |