IA HF4 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 559.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act modifying requirements related to teacher intern license programs and licenses and authorizations issued by the board of educational examiners and establishing a temporary initial teaching license to be issued by the board of educational examiners to applicants who complete an alternative teacher certification program.(See HF 255.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act modifying requirements related to teacher intern license programs and licenses and authorizations issued by the board of educational examiners and establishing a temporary initial teaching license to be issued by the board of educational examiners to applicants who complete an alternative teacher certification program.(See HF 255.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-08HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 559.
2023-02-09HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 255.
2023-02-07HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277.
2023-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
2023-01-24HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 12:00PM House Lounge.
2023-01-12HouseSubcommittee: Stone, Gehlbach and Madison. H.J. 95.
2023-01-11HouseIntroduced, referred to Education. H.J. 57.

Same As/Similar To

HF255 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Amendment S-5005 filed. S.J. 256.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback