IA HF396 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the definition of child foster care for purposes of child care provided by a relative of a child. (Formerly HSB 81.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the definition of child foster care for purposes of child care provided by a relative of a child. (Formerly HSB 81.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142. |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1075. |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1075. |
2017-04-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 978. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 960. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 959. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 816. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Ragan, and Shipley. S.J. 580. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 541. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 541. |
2017-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 563. |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays 0. H.J. 547. |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 423. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB81 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 411.
SSB1069 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee: Costello, Chelgren, and Mathis.
SSB1069 (Related) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee: Costello, Chelgren, and Mathis.