IA HF393 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 606.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 606.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonpublic schools, including authorizing nonpublic schools to withdraw applications for accreditation, authorizing accredited nonpublic schools to terminate accreditation, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 606.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonpublic schools, including authorizing nonpublic schools to withdraw applications for accreditation, authorizing accredited nonpublic schools to terminate accreditation, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 606.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 606. |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 487. |
2023-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2023 10:00AM House Lounge 2. |
2023-02-23 | House | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Cahill and Fry. H.J. 417. |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 388. |
Same As/Similar To
HF606 (Similar To) 2024-01-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/11/2024 12:00PM RM 19 (Cancelled).
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF393 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF393.html |