IA HF393 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 982.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 982.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the reporting of certain gifts and bequests received by the executive branch. (Formerly HSB 53.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the reporting of certain gifts and bequests received by the executive branch. (Formerly HSB 53.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 982. |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 946. |
2019-04-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 809. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 925. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 922. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Substituted for SF 446. S.J. 921. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 446. S.J. 598. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 598. |
2019-03-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 523. |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 513. |
2019-03-12 | House | Amendment H-1015 lost. H.J. 513. |
2019-03-11 | House | Amendment H-1015 filed. H.J. 498. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 295. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB53 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 261.