IA HF369 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to vital statistics certificates or records and vital statistics fees collected by the state and county registrars of vital statistics. (Formerly HF 23) (See Cmte. Bill HF 662)
Title
A bill for an act relating to vital statistics certificates or records and vital statistics fees collected by the state and county registrars of vital statistics. (Formerly HF 23) (See Cmte. Bill HF 662)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1021. |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-04-02 | House | Subcommittee, Windschitl, Brown-Powers, and Sands. H.J. 748. |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 370. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HF369 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF369.html |