IA HF340 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing length of service award programs for volunteer fire fighters, volunteer emergency medical care providers, and reserve peace officers, and making appropriations.(Formerly HF 193, HSB 19.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing length of service award programs for volunteer fire fighters, volunteer emergency medical care providers, and reserve peace officers, and making appropriations.(Formerly HF 193, HSB 19.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/28/2023 12:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Giddens, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 633. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 572. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 572. |
2023-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 620. |
2023-03-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 653. |
2023-03-14 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 615. |
2023-03-13 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 367. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB19 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 193.
HF193 (Similar To) 2023-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 620.
SF272 (Similar To) 2023-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 447. S.J. 441.
SF447 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Subcommittee: Zumbach, Giddens, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 543.
HF193 (Similar To) 2023-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 620.
SF272 (Similar To) 2023-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 447. S.J. 441.
SF447 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Subcommittee: Zumbach, Giddens, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 543.