IA HF340 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 769.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 769.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain fees charged in connection with vehicle rental agreements and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 24) (See Cmte. Bill HF 622)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain fees charged in connection with vehicle rental agreements and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 24) (See Cmte. Bill HF 622)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 769. |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-16 | House | Subcommittee, Nunn, Baltimore, and Ruff. H.J. 583. |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 353. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HF340 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF340.html |