IA HF336 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to postconviction relief procedure and the underlying trial court record of the proceedings challenged. (Formerly HSB 28.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to postconviction relief procedure and the underlying trial court record of the proceedings challenged. (Formerly HSB 28.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 922. |
2019-04-18 | House | SF 158 substituted. H.J. 910. |
2019-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1239 adopted. H.J. 910. |
2019-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1239 filed. H.J. 900. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756. |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 244. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1005 (Related) 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB28 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 232.
SF158 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
HSB28 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 232.
SF158 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF336 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF336.html |