IA HF323 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 644.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 644.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the confidentiality of search warrant information in a criminal case resulting in an acquittal or a dismissal. (See HF 581.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the confidentiality of search warrant information in a criminal case resulting in an acquittal or a dismissal. (See HF 581.)
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 644. |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 493. |
2017-02-21 | House | Subcommittee: Kerr, Fry and Olson. H.J. 427. |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 300. |
Same As/Similar To
HF581 (Similar To) 2017-04-07 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF323 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF323.html |