IA HF318 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Education. S.J. 622.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Education. S.J. 622.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the statewide preschool program by modifying provisions relating to eligibility, funding, and compulsory attendance and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 14.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the statewide preschool program by modifying provisions relating to eligibility, funding, and compulsory attendance and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 14.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Education. S.J. 622. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 716. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2021 1:00PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Cournoyer, and Quirmbach. S.J. 570. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 548. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 548. |
2021-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 630. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 697. |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 625. |
2021-02-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 262. |
Same As/Similar To
HF14 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.