IA HF313 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the removal of motor vehicles involved in certain accidents from the roadway, and providing a penalty. (Formerly HSB 70.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the removal of motor vehicles involved in certain accidents from the roadway, and providing a penalty. (Formerly HSB 70.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1148. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147. |
2017-04-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1000. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 982. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 979. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 735. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Danielson, and Zumbach. S.J. 413. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 391. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 391. |
2017-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 451. |
2017-03-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 504. |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays 0. H.J. 439. |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 277. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1039 (Related) 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB70 (Related) 2018-05-03 - NOBA: House Sub
HSB70 (Related) 2018-05-03 - NOBA: House Sub