IA HF3 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Subcommittee reassigned, Kinney, Bisignano, and Schneider. S.J. 724.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Subcommittee reassigned, Kinney, Bisignano, and Schneider. S.J. 724.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to invasion of privacy and trespassing, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to invasion of privacy and trespassing, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned, Kinney, Bisignano, and Schneider. S.J. 724. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee, Horn, Schneider, and Taylor. S.J. 681. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 662. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 662. |
2015-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 659. |
2015-03-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 690. |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 645. |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee amendment H-1022 adopted. H.J. 645. |
2015-03-18 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee amendment H-1022 filed. H.J. 485. |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 481. |
2015-01-24 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee, Jones, Kaufmann, and Wolfe. H.J. 142. |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 93. |