IA HF295 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 825.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act prohibiting counties and cities from establishing certain regulations relating to employment matters and the sale or marketing of consumer merchandise, providing for properly related matters, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 92.) Effective 3-30-17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act prohibiting counties and cities from establishing certain regulations relating to employment matters and the sale or marketing of consumer merchandise, providing for properly related matters, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 92.) Effective 3-30-17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 825.
2017-03-29HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 808.
2017-03-29HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 808.
2017-03-27HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 787.
2017-03-27SenateImmediate message. S.J. 776.
2017-03-27SenatePassed Senate, ayes 29, nays 21. S.J. 776.
2017-03-27SenateAmendment S-3253 filed, lost. S.J. 775.
2017-03-27SenateAmendment S-3252 lost. S.J. 774.
2017-03-27SenateAmendment S-3255 filed, lost. S.J. 773.
2017-03-27SenateDeferred. S.J. 773.
2017-03-27SenateAmendment S-3252 filed. S.J. 773.
2017-03-22SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 735.
2017-03-15SenateSubcommittee: Feenstra, Bisignano, and Chapman. S.J. 622.
2017-03-13SenateReferred to State Government. S.J. 580.
2017-03-10SenateRead first time, passed on file. S.J. 562.
2017-03-10SenateMessage from House. S.J. 562.
2017-03-09HouseImmediate message. H.J. 605.
2017-03-09HousePassed House, ayes 56, nays 41. H.J. 601.
2017-03-09HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 605.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1115 lost. H.J. 600.
2017-03-09HouseSponsors added, to H-1143 - Brown-Powers, T. Taylor, Bearinger, M. Smith, Cohoon, Gaskill, Bennett, Winckler, Lensing, Steckman, Kurth, Miller, Hunter, Mascher, R. Smith, Anderson, Kearns, Ourth, Breckenridge, Isenhart, Olson, Running-Marquardt, Nielsen, Oldson, McConkey and Jacoby. H.J. 605.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1143 lost. H.J. 599.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1137 adopted. H.J. 599.
2017-03-09HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 605.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1142 lost. H.J. 598.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1169 withdrawn. H.J. 597.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1107 adopted, as amended. H.J. 597.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1154 to H-1107 adopted. H.J. 597.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1164 to H-1107 withdrawn. H.J. 596.
2017-03-09HousePoint of order raised H-1164 to H-1107, ruled germane. H.J. 595.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1173 to H-1107 lost. H.J. 595.
2017-03-09HouseSponsor added, to H-1173 to H-1107 - Prichard. H.J. 605.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1173 to H-1107 filed. H.J. 594.
2017-03-09HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 594.
2017-03-09HouseMotion to suspend rules to consider H-1130. H.J. 593.
2017-03-09HousePoint of order raised on H-1130, ruled not germane. H.J. 593.
2017-03-08HouseAmendments H-1164 and H-1169 filed. H.J. 565.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1154 filed. H.J. 544.
2017-03-06HouseAmendments H-1115, H-1130, H-1137, H-1142 and H-1143 filed. H.J. 517.
2017-02-21HouseAmendment H-1107 filed. H.J. 431.
2017-02-14HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 273.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback