IA HF295 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to wastewater discharges by on-farm processing operations. (See Cmte. Bill HF 464)
Title
A bill for an act relating to wastewater discharges by on-farm processing operations. (See Cmte. Bill HF 464)
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Drake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-21 | Withdrawn. H.J. 736. | |
2011-02-21 | Subcommittee, Klein, Byrnes, and Kelley. H.J. 376. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Environmental Protection. H.J. 347. |