IA HF281 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 1029.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act concerning county supervisor representation plans and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 116.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act concerning county supervisor representation plans and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 116.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04HouseRereferred to Local Government. H.J. 1029.
2023-03-21HouseSF 443 substituted. H.J. 693.
2023-03-21HouseAmendment H-1131 adopted. H.J. 693.
2023-03-16HouseAmendment H-1131 filed. H.J. 675.
2023-03-09HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 596.
2023-03-01HouseFiscal note.
2023-02-13HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 301.

Same As/Similar To

HF116 (Similar To) 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 281.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback