IA HF268 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the department of management to establish and operate a searchable internet site containing budget, audit, and financial information of school districts.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the department of management to establish and operate a searchable internet site containing budget, audit, and financial information of school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Hinson, Deyoe and Mascher. H.J. 252. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 220. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF268 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF268.html |