IA HF2642 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Amendments H-8355, H-8356, H-8357, and H-8358 filed. H.J. 874.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Amendments H-8355, H-8356, H-8357, and H-8358 filed. H.J. 874.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the conservation and improvement of soil and water resources, including by providing for the administration of associated programs and regulations, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 2614, HSB 674.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the conservation and improvement of soil and water resources, including by providing for the administration of associated programs and regulations, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 2614, HSB 674.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Amendments H-8355, H-8356, H-8357, and H-8358 filed. H.J. 874. |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment H-8257 filed. H.J. 698. |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment H-8255 filed. H.J. 698. |
2024-03-20 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2024-03-20 | House | Amendments H-8231 and H-8234 filed. H.J. 633. |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587. |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 533. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB674 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2614.
HF2614 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2642.
HF2614 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2642.