IA HF2624 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating the railroad reconstruction or replacement tax credit available against the individual and corporate income taxes, the franchise tax, the insurance premiums tax, and the moneys and credits tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act creating the railroad reconstruction or replacement tax credit available against the individual and corporate income taxes, the franchise tax, the insurance premiums tax, and the moneys and credits tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 8:15AM House Lounge 2. |
2024-03-06 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Best and Croken. H.J. 536. |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 342. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2624 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2624.html |