IA HF2620 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to flying our colors special registration plates.(Formerly HF 2079.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to flying our colors special registration plates.(Formerly HF 2079.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseFiscal note.
2020-03-11HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 572.

Same As/Similar To

SF2026 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2181. S.J. 245.
HF2079 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 569.
SF2181 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback